Financial history TRANSITIONS COUNSELLING & TRAINING SERVICES

Charity number: 1137516
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2014 30/08/2015 30/08/2016 30/08/2017 30/08/2018
Total gross income £2.26k £2.14k £7.41k £2.81k £250
Total expenditure £5.27k £2.61k £3.34k £4.15k £830
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A