Financial history ACT AGAINST INJUSTICE

Charity number: 1138594
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £2.00k £1.37k £801 £435 £290
Total expenditure £1.82k £1.25k £783 £400 £285
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A