Accounts and annual returns CREATION SCIENCE UK

Charity number: 1142460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 19 August 2024 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 25 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 02 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required