Financial history THE TRUTH FOUNDATION (AL HAQQ)

Charity number: 1141527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.52k £15.38k £12.51k £14.99k £16.69k
Total expenditure £17.08k £16.41k £14.45k £13.71k £15.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A