Financial history LADYBIRD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1123163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £95.98k £95.84k £103.59k £122.24k £161.39k
Total expenditure £97.64k £105.88k £108.59k £118.83k £150.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A