Accounts and annual returns LONDON RIVERSIDE CHURCH

Charity number: 1124475
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 November 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 November 2024 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 December 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 December 2022 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window