Financial history GOOD SHEPHERD CHURCH

Charity number: 1125607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £56.85k £67.01k £79.82k £80.94k £71.92k
Total expenditure £54.51k £67.18k £71.74k £81.97k £77.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.44k £11.01k N/A N/A