Accounts and annual returns HENRY HINDE JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1127978
Charity reporting is up to date (165 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 12 November 2024 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 November 2023 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 October 2021 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 September 2021 454 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required