Financial history THORNHILL BAPTIST CHURCH, SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1126884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £183.66k £185.28k £177.22k £226.90k £230.21k
Total expenditure £191.25k £176.11k £204.10k £225.49k £261.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A