Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PAUL SKELMERSDALE
Charity number: 1128068

Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHRISTOPHER BAMFORD SPITTLE | Chair | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
June Hughes | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Anne Bennett | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Kenyon | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
June Ann Price | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JONES | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN GARETH DAVIES | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA JUDITH OAKLEY | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 20 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LYNN CURRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEN SKELTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.