Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF RUPERT HOUSE

Charity number: 1133193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 September 2023 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 August 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 November 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required