Accounts and annual returns POSITIVE STRIDES UK

Charity Number: 1129757
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2012 07 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2012 07 March 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2011 21 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 22 February 2012 On Time