Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, WESTBURY-ON-TRYM
Charity number: 1128488

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANDRE HENDRIK HART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clare Melody Waggett | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Marianne Jane Ailes | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Alison Burton | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Joseph Turner | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Memery | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick John Harris | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Liddle | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bourne-Worster | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Ailes | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Troughton | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS GILL HOWSE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE HOARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CANON DAVID ROBERT MCGREGOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH ROBERT YEANDEL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.