Accounts and annual returns CANALSIDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1128160
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 18 March 2024 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 March 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required