Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WICKFORD AND RUNWELL
Charity number: 1128199

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAMELA EVELYN PETTS | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Adrian Harvey Evens | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Stephen Tyler | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Wagstaff | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marina Marjorie Bailey | Trustee | 04 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Talbot | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Victor Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oluseye Babmunde Abiodun | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Catherine Doe | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Frank Tricker | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Jacqueline Wise | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steve Lissenden | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Feldwick | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE MARGARET BRANSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARJORIE STANFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.