Trustees DAGNALL STREET BAPTIST CHURCH ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1127791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Megan Thompson Trustee 10 November 2024
None on record
Joanne Foster Trustee 10 November 2024
None on record
Ian Pearce Trustee 10 November 2024
None on record
Tomi Odesola Trustee 10 November 2024
None on record
Janet Movery-Peers Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Diane Saunders Trustee 06 November 2018
None on record
Alison Ashmore Trustee 06 November 2018
None on record
Paula Iddiols Trustee 01 November 2016
None on record
Trevor John Oakley Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
CHRISTOPHER PENN Trustee
None on record
JANIS MORSE Trustee
None on record