Financial history MAGNIFICENT MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1129194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £51.34k £47.09k £33.44k £44.81k £50.64k
Total expenditure £36.33k £14.32k £5.36k £10.01k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A