Accounts and annual returns STUDLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1140133
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 170 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 170 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 536 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 536 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 18 November 2020 On Time