Accounts and annual returns CWMLAI PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1128712
Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 October 2022 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 September 2020 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required