Financial history THE MOIRA FUND

Charity number: 1129693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.33k £33.68k £48.92k £51.39k £53.75k
Total expenditure £31.95k £18.70k £45.25k £51.73k £46.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.00k £14.50k