Financial history FRIENDS OF ELMWOOD SCHOOL (SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS)

Charity number: 1130129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £26.83k £12.68k £9.94k £24.16k £27.31k
Total expenditure £28.29k £12.33k £4.13k £27.02k £24.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A