Financial history SHAH JALAL MOSQUE AND COMMUNITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1131413
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £29.02k £17.81k £21.53k £21.59k £9.42k
Total expenditure £33.08k £18.31k £12.35k £14.52k £23.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A