Accounts and annual returns BOURNE GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1130137
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 29 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 07 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 16 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 04 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required