Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF INKBERROW WITH COOKHILL AND KINGTON WITH DORMSTON IN THE DIOCESE OF WORCESTER

Charity number: 1128627
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 24 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 April 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 22 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 22 October 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 26 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 26 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 26 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 26 October 2012 On Time