Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE TURNER HODGKISS COMMUNITY NATURE RESERVE

Charity Number: 1129947
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £1.51k £1.83k £815 £1.83k £1.59k
Total expenditure £2.46k £531 £1.37k £831 £1.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A