Trustees THE GROVE CENTRE CHURCH
Charity number: 1129070

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN EARNEST BROMLEY | Chair | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Neal | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cutts | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Warren | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Janet Clark-Gardiner | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRACE HARAWA | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Avril Ann Sydee | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH REID NOON | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frank Richard Neal | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JONATHAN TREECE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.