Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAWLEY
Charity number: 1130589

Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Francis Pitfield Perry | Chair | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allen Brown | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Davies | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian King | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Popay | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hoy | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Carter | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Paul Murton | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GUNSTON | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Brown | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Harry Bangs | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Earl Rapley | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Wilkinson | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Blanchard | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rita Audrey DAVIES | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.