Accounts and annual returns KINGDOM LIGHT MINISTRY

Charity number: 1130208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 05 March 2025 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 09 March 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 23 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 15 March 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required