Financial history SERGEANTS' MESS RAF BENSON

Charity Number: 1129703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £135.89k £148.96k £117.72k £129.16k £118.13k
Total expenditure £139.38k £100.38k £88.26k £141.46k £187.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A