Financial history LITTLE OWLS PRESCHOOL (BOXTED)

Charity number: 1129755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £141.51k £148.91k £166.00k £158.04k £193.65k
Total expenditure £136.64k £145.50k £149.01k £158.15k £174.04k
Income from government contracts £114.74k £115.30k £119.09k £115.79k £133.20k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.00k N/A £5.83k