Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CATHERINE & ST PAUL, HODDESDON
Charity number: 1129941
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DR RACHEL ELIZABETH BURROWS PENNANT | Chair | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Katherine Elizabeth Carter | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr DIANA ROSEMARY FORREST | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Clark | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JIM NICOLSON | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELYN HELEN BILLING | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR EVERETT | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA WARNER PARKER B ED HONS | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIE PERKINS | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MIKE MARSH BSc | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
IRENE JENNIFER LINNELL BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY FIONA MARSH CertEd | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.