Accounts and annual returns CHURCH LANE (LOWTON ) COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1131347
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 February 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required