Accounts and annual returns THE KINGSTON UPON THAMES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1131219
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2016 09 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 18 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2014 09 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required