Financial history PENRALLT BAPTIST CHURCH, BANGOR

Charity number: 1131224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £117.86k £104.01k £123.91k £111.88k £131.30k
Total expenditure £112.22k £105.33k £129.86k £142.62k £153.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A