THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY & ST ETHELBURGA, LYMINGE WITH ST OSWALDS, PADDLESWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC is committed to enabling as many as possible to worship in church and become part of our parish community. Services put faith into practice through prayer, scripture, music and sacrament. We endeavour to provide pastoral care to those in need in the parish, together with mission and outreach work To facilitate this it is important that we maintain the fabric of the church building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 25 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- LYMINGE PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY & ST ETHELBURGA, LYMINGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Trini Mari Carolina Bates | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
GARY GEORGE COLVIN MA, FCIPD | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Goody | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sharman | Trustee | 19 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Alice Hawken BSc Hons | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sqn Ldr Ret'd Philip Herwin George Hawken BA. RAF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LYNNE LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David George Staveley B Sc | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Stephen Geore Dougal | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Robert Ian Lane | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Diana Mary Baldwin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Wg Cdr Ret'd Michael Richard Steele Chinneck RAF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lt Cdr Derek Peter Smith RN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.29k | £149.53k | £123.01k | £62.11k | £73.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.28k | £167.55k | £136.69k | £86.47k | £67.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 16 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EBENEZA
BRADY ROAD
LYMINGE
FOLKESTONE
CT18 8HA
- Phone:
- 01303862151
- Email:
- office@lymingechurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window