Financial history STANDPROUD

Charity Number: 1132615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £11.20k £8.32k £11.68k £8.55k £7.48k
Total expenditure £567 £376 £65.30k £51.56k £226.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A