Financial history TALKING2MINDS LTD

Charity number: 1131142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.94k £23.32k £26.93k £7.56k £6.34k
Total expenditure £14.86k £21.17k £30.33k £18.97k £14.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A