Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WORTH, POUND HILL & MAIDENBOWER
Charity number: 1131090

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL JOHN BOAG | Chair | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEWIS FRY | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gordon Martin Winn Parry | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Francis John Michael Pole | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donald Edward Hewerdine | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Norma Stanford | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anita Bhargava Wilkinson | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Pelissier | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Greta Jane Sawyer | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Anderson | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Upchurch | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN STEPHEN SMITH | Trustee | 04 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.