Trustees OLTON BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1130659

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Roger Hopton | Chair | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nina Susan Clark | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joseph David Belcher | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ogemdi Ndudi Ekwegh | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Mcclelland | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Nancy Johnston | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Diane Ford | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHEESMAN FCIPD | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.