Financial history OFFICERS' MESS RAF VALLEY

Charity number: 1132769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £79.65k £28.56k £74.04k £83.61k £112.82k
Total expenditure £45.52k £18.89k £104.23k £87.17k £114.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A