Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ROTHWELL, LEEDS
Charity number: 1131177

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Ward | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl David Burwell | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Burwell | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Land | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abhijit David | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Howell Mayers | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Franks | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA FRANCES HARVEY LYNCH | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHN LYNCH | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE CRESSALL BA HONS | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN SHUTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK WILKINSON BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE BLAKEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.