Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN & ST NICHOLAS
Charity number: 1131951

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Simon Stride | Chair | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ross | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Judith Cashin | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Lindoe | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Derek Cashin | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Barbara Moore | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Hutton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Craig | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Brassey | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Campbell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Gilmartin | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Beattie | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
EVAN HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Bassett | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ANN NILE | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE KIELTY | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE CHESTERS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.