Accounts and annual returns BRIGHTON & HOVE REFORM SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1132661
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 23 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 23 July 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 17 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 17 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 15 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 15 August 2012 On Time