Accounts and annual returns GARRISON GIRLS

Charity number: 1139264
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2016 28 March 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 03 May 2016 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required