Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ROCHESTER
Charity number: 1132260
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Joel Love | Chair | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bonnie Chandler | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Timlick | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Francis Ball | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ruth Teruel-Pyrke | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ward | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juia Hawkins | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Monica Aldridge | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joy Alison Wilson | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Seth-Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Porter | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael O'Connor | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER CORNELL | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JANE MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA MARY CORNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.