Accounts and annual returns RICHMOND CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1131956
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 06 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 11 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 30 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 30 October 2013 On Time