Trustees TAUNTON BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1132949

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Matcham | Chair | 28 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Barbara Ann Wager | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Janet Eveline Gillett | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Steven James Reed | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
David Jonathan fletcher | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Mike Wager | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN VENN | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.