Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH BRIXTON ROAD
Charity number: 1132845

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Hugo Adan Fernandez | Chair | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alba Lopez Osorio | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Robert Alexander Jullien | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caiwen Yong | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Yepes | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Posada Solano | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Grantham | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Burton | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROTIMI MEGHOMA | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mrs C Brooks-Johnson | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.