Financial history LANCASHIRE AMATEUR FOOTBALL LEAGUE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 500587
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2019 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023
Total gross income £1 £9.71k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.78k £0 £0 £0 £250
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A