Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD, CARSHALTON BEECHES
Charity Number: 1132301

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna-Marie Garratt | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Suzanne Stevens | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Clynton Graystone | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Nott | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LESLIE MUNT | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Ann Hudson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Jadwiga Rutt | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Roger Crompton | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Louise Strivens | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Thompson | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Potter | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DILANI PRIYANTHI PARARAJASINGAM | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev KEVIN JAMES LEWIS | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH GERMAIN | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH CHARLOTTE FLOWERS | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN NUTTING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.